Bega, Sivan (CPSO#: 90779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Durbin, Sivan (used until: 06 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 645-9097
Fax: (416) 645-9097
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Bega Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bega ( CPSO# 90779 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone Number: (416) 645-9097

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVAN BEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014