Begin, Nicolas Andre (CPSO#: 77870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4289 Innes Rd
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: 613-686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLAS ANDRE BEGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEGIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007