Begum-Hasan, Jahanara (CPSO#: 79948)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2008