Behjati, Mohammad Reza (CPSO#: 81419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rough hospital
Department of Pathology
2867 Ellesmere Rd, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 281- 745 Ext. 5135
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behjati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Behjati ( CPSO# 81419 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA BEHJATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHJATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2011