Behzadi, Arian (CPSO#: 111266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Hospital
Kennedy Road Clinic
Mental Health Outpatient Program
J - 1225 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone: (416) 431-8135
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arian Behzadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Behzadi ( CPSO# 111266)

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Kennedy Road Clinic
Community Mental Health Outpatient Program
J - 1225 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8135

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIAN BEHZADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHZADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 07 Apr 2017
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018