Beiner, Mario Emanuel (CPSO#: 83898)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 22 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008