Belanger, Eric Charles (CPSO#: 74850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Pathology and
Laboratory Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zuzana Kos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kos ( CPSO# 86761 )
Dr. E. Belanger ( CPSO# 74850 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road Box 117
4th Floor CCW
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC CHARLES BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006