Belanger, Mathieu (CPSO#: 94840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inovo Medical
1328 Labrie Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1B 3M1
Phone: (613) 749-4668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathieu Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belanger ( CPSO# 94840 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., February 15, 2018, by order of the Discipline Commitee of
            the College of  Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Mathieu Belanger:

                  Approval of the College's Out of Hospital Premises program is required
                  before Dr. Belanger resumes the Medical Director role in an Out of
                  Hospital Premises.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mathieu Bélanger has 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

Dr. Bélanger is a family physician who practises in the area of interventional pain management. 
Dr. Bélanger currently works at, and owns, the Inovo Medical clinic in Ottawa, a clinic that 
provides interventional pain management procedures. Dr. Bélanger was the Medical Director of 
Inovo. Following referral of this matter to discipline and at the request of the College, Dr. 
Bélanger appointed an acting Medical Director, effective August 22, 2017. 

Nerve blocks, which are categorized as Level 2 Interventional Pain Management procedures, are 
only authorized to be performed in an Out-of-Hospital premises (“OHP”) that is approved by the 
College. Between October 15 and January 2016, Dr. Bélanger provided interventional pain 
treatments to patients, including Level 2 nerve blocks, while working in a clinic that was not an 
approved OHP.  

Dr. Bélanger was aware of the requirement that Level 2 procedures can only be performed in an 
OHP that has been approved and that responsibility for notifying the College’s OHP program is 
on the physician. He was aware that the clinic where he was performing Level 2 procedures was 
not an approved OHP, had never been inspected under the Out of Hospital Premises Inspection 
Program, did not meet program requirements and that he was not authorized to provide Level 2 
procedures in that location. 

There is no evidence that Dr. Bélanger’s performance of any of these procedures caused any 
harm to any patients.  

As part of the College investigation, information was obtained from the Ontario Health Insurance 
Plan (“OHIP”). The information from OHIP confirms that Dr. Bélanger submitted claims to 
OHIP between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, for Level 2 procedures, particularly 
nerve blocks, that were performed by Dr. Bélanger at the clinic that was not an approved OHP. 
The OHIP information indicates that between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, Dr. 
Bèlanger billed approximately $103,428.00 for performing Level 2 procedures in the clinic that 
was not an approved OHP, that are only authorized to be performed in an OHP.  

DISPOSITION 

The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Bélanger’s Certificate of Registration for a five (5) month period, 
   effective February 17th, 2018 at 12:01 a.m. 
-  The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bélanger’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
      o  Dr. Bélanger will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and 
         professionalism, at his own expense, within (twelve) 12 months of the date of this 
         Order, or any alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. 
         Dr. Bélanger  will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program 
         and provide proof of completion to the College; 
      o  Approval of the College’s Out of Hospital Premises program is required before Dr. 
         Bélanger resumes the Medical Director role in an Out of Hospital Premises.  
-  Dr. Bélanger to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Bélanger to pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
   ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 15, 2018

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: October 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.
The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) 1 count of Uttering Threat to cause death between October 1, 2016 and October 31, 2017 at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 264.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(2) 3 counts of Assault at various times between the dates of October 1, 2016 and October 31, 2017 at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(3) 1 count of Forcible Confinement between October 1, 2016 and October 31, 2017 at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(4) 1 count of Mischief (damaging property) Under $5000 between June 20, 2017 and June 26, 2017, at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 430(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(5) 1 count of Criminal Harassment by repeated communications between October 26, 2017 and November 27, 2017 at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 264(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: December 27, 2017
Place of charges: Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: October 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal.

The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[December 15, 2017]

1. notify specified officer from Ottawa Police Service of any change in his address, employment or occupation;

2. abstain from communicating directly or indirectly with specified persons or from going within 200 metres of their residence, place of employment, school or anywhere they may be at;

3. to abstain from possessing a firearm and to surrender to specified officer from Ottawa Police Service any firearm in his possession and any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling the acquisition or possession of a firearm; and

4. not to possess any weapons including knives and cross-bows as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.