Belchetz, Gregory Jon (CPSO#: 71376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovard Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: 9057926949
Fax: 9057926977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Belchetz ( CPSO# 71376 )

Business Address:
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-6949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JON BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002