Belej-Rak, Timea (CPSO#: 73833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Belej, Timea (used until: 06 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9955 Yonge Street
Suite 201
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M6
Phone: 905-237-4411
Fax: 833-217-9884
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Belej-Rak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2009


Corporation Name: Belej-Rak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Belej-Rak ( CPSO# 73833 )

Business Address:
Anova Fertility & Reproductive Health
650 - 25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone Number: (416) 225-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMEA BELEJ-RAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELEJ-RAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004