Beletsky, Vadim (CPSO#: 75976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: Beletsky, Vadim Yurievitch (used until: 30 Sep 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute H4
PO BOX 5777 / STN B
London ON N6A 4V2
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Fax: (519) 452-4552
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vadim Beletsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Beletsky ( CPSO# 75976 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VADIM BELETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELETSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 May 2002 to 27 May 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014