Bell, Allan Curtis (CPSO#: 84628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street East
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 5466
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Curtis Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bell ( CPSO# 84628 )

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
Queen's University
Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Site
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN CURTIS BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008