Bell, Cecil David (CPSO#: 19540)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. David Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 25 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018