Bell, Georgina Lorraine (CPSO#: 85831)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 500 Hogarth Avenue Geraldton ON P0T 1M0
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018