Bell, Lisa (CPSO#: 86827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Butcher, Lisa (used until: 28 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale CHC
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.R. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bell ( CPSO# 86827 )
Dr. B. Bell ( CPSO# 88772 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 490-1335

Business Address:
2830 Keele Street
2nd Floor
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 633-6812

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009