Bell, Scott Christopher (CPSO#: 61177)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010