Bella, Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 73773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
1 Centerpoint Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 727-0099
Fax: (613) 727-1099
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. J. Bella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. A. J. Bella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bella ( CPSO# 73773 )

Business Address:
302 - 1 Centerpointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 727-0099

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOSEPH BELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007