Belluzzo, Neal (CPSO#: 73389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

431 King Street East
247 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6304
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

247 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4L 3B5
Canada
Phone: 416 466 6800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Belluzzo ( CPSO# 73389 )

Business Address:
Yorkview Medical Centre
Suite 104
3695 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 633-3711

Business Address:
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 368-6304

Business Address:
287 CoxwellAvenue
Toronto ON  M4L 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 466-6800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL BELLUZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLUZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001