Ben Musa, Anas Ahmed T (CPSO#: 72892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardio-Vascular Surgery Department
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M1B3
Phone: 5197443311 Ext. 6428
Fax: (905) 306-7607
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault area Hospital
Vascular surgery department
750 Great northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sault area Hospital
Vascular surgery department
750 Great northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sault Area Hospital
Critical Care Medicine Department
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5500
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Grand Revier Hospital
Critical Care medicine Department
P.O.Box 9056
835 King Street west
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611 Ext. 2631
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anas Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2018


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ben Musa ( CPSO# 72892 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B3
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAS AHMED T BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007