Ben Nachum, Ilanit (CPSO#: 92030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2013

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilanit Ben Nachum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ben Nachum ( CPSO# 92030 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ilanit Ben Nachum may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Western  Ontario, in which Dr. Ben Nachum
                        holds an academic appointment at the  rank  of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Ben Nachum  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Ben Nachum's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Ben  Nachum's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  February  1,  2013.   In  accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended  by  the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 31, 2020.