Ben Saleh, Adel Hassen (CPSO#: 73137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Assogate Medical Clinic
400 - 20 14th Street West
Prince Albert SK  S6V 3K8
Phone: (306) 764-1513

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL HASSEN BEN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 26 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 26 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008