Bencharif, Sarah-Taissir (CPSO#: 113098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Ave
Room EM-206
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH-TAISSIR BENCHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCHARIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018