Bendago, Mansour Mustafa (CPSO#: 67366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
1825 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z9
Phone: (416) 284-4420
Fax: (416) 284-5543
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 110- 5400 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 5R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 221 5554
Fax: (416) 360-0045
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bendago Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2006


Corporation Name: Bendago Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bendago ( CPSO# 67366 )

Business Address:
213 - 1825 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z9
Phone Number: (416) 284-4420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 2, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mansour Mustafa Bendago,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bendago has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. MANSOUR MUSTAFA BENDAGO
                                            ("Dr. Bendago")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bendago, certificate of registration number 67366, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216359 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my plastic surgery
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.
            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, for an initial visit and then once
                              every month for a total of four (4) visits; 
                        (iv)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical
                        inspector, received March 12, 2018, and the report of the
                        out-of-hospital premises inspector, received March 6, 2017, and any
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendices "A" and "B" to this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including
                        but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and
                        ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP attached as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              recordkeeping; 
                        (ii)  review and preparation of written summaries of the current
                              College policies on Medical Records, Consent to Treatment,
                              and Delegation of Controlled Acts, and the Out of Hospital
                              Premises Inspection Program Standards; 
                        (iii) review of relevant clinical practice guidelines with my
                              Clinical Supervisor, as further described in the detailed IEP
                              attached as Appendix "B;" and
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the date on which I execute this undertaking, or, if
                        no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, an interview with me, interviews
                        with my colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any
                        Out-of-Hospital Premises and/or Independent Health Facilities with
                        which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my
                        "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bendago, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bendago, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bendago
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        plastic surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Bendago will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for three months. 
                  
                        Dr. Bendago will engage in professional education in medical
                        recordkeeping, as well as review of relevant policies and clinical
                        practice guidelines.
                        Dr. Bendago's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College within six months of the end of the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bendago, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Bendago, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Bendago, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Bendago, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mansour Mustafa Bendago to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bendago engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his plastic surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Bendago will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for three months.

Dr. Bendago will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, as well as review of relevant policies and clinical practice guidelines.

Dr. Bendago’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)