Bendavid, Yves (CPSO#: 78278)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009