Bengezi, Omar Abdalla (CPSO#: 71787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 788-0555
Fax: (905) 788-3362
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 732-6111
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 358-0171
Fax: (905) 358-8435
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Bengezi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Bengezi ( CPSO# 71787 )

Business Address:
115 - 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 788-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR ABDALLA BENGEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGEZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2004