Bengough, Michael Norman (CPSO#: 88322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael N. Bengough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bengough ( CPSO# 88322 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NORMAN BENGOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGOUGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009