Benjamin, Lynne Ann (CPSO#: 58394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone: (905) 842-2179
Fax: (905) 842-8071
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNNE ANN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988