Benjamin, Matthew Stephen (CPSO#: 78474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew S. Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Benjamin ( CPSO# 78474 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW STEPHEN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004