Benk, Veronique Andree Marie (CPSO#: 74580)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Lille II, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 13 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004