Bennett, Barbara Fiebig (CPSO#: 85339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:East Tennessee State University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Urban Core Community Health Centre, 71 Rebecca Street, Hamilton, ON L8R 1B6
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016