Bennett, Mark Robert Gerald (CPSO#: 91065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Anxiety Treatment & Research Centre
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35373
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Twin Lakes Clinical Services
550 Fennell Ave East, Unit 16A
Hamilton ON  L8V 4S9
Canada
Phone: 1-800-789-1773
Fax: 905-318-9343
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark R G Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bennett ( CPSO# 91065 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Anxiety Treatment & Research Centre
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT GERALD BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014