Bennett, Teresa Ann (CPSO#: 76554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Child Health Centre
325 Wellington Rd. NOth, 3rd floor
Hamilton ON
L8L 0A4
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77294
Fax: (905) 521-7938
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin W.Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 77648 )
Dr. T. Bennett ( CPSO# 76554 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre T Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2-163
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 408-3677

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA ANN BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006