Bentov, Yaakov Haim (CPSO#: 85509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ANOVA
6th Floor
Unit 650
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440
Fax: (416) 640-9454
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

430 The Boardwalk
Suite 402
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: 226-647-8020
Fax: 519 488 0632
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yaakov Bentov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Bentov ( CPSO# 85509 )

Business Address:
402 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (416) 318-8856

Business Address:
6th Floor
650-25 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone Number: (416) 225-4440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Yaakov  Haim  Bentov  may  practise  medicine independently in gynecologic
            reproductive endocrinology and infertility.