Berall, Murray Jay (CPSO#: 52452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Renal Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (416) 658-2242
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A3Z8
Canada
Phone: 416-588-3788
Fax: 416-588-5633
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Wilson Sleep Clinic
Unit 15
951 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 746-7016
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Berall ( CPSO# 52452 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Renal Unit
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (416) 588-3788

Business Address:
15 - 951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 746-3012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY JAY BERALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986