Berardi, Philip (CPSO#: 91067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
Division of Anatomical Pathology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 77024
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP BERARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015