Berbari, Patricia (CPSO#: 75205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Montreal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555A boulevard de la Gappe
Gatineau QC  J8T8N7
Phone: 8192437667
Fax: 8192439485
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 A Boulevard de la Gappe
gatineau QC  J8T 8N7
Canada
Phone: (819) 243-9922
Fax: (819) 243-9485
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 06 Oct 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA BERBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001