Berberich, Amanda Jean (CPSO#: 96108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: Brahm, Amanda Jean (used until: 28 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6245
Fax: 5196466067
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA JEAN BERBERICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBERICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016