Bercik, Premysl (CPSO#: 79956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Slovak, Spanish

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73495
Fax: (905) 521-4958
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bercik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bercik ( CPSO# 79956 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Suite HSC 3N9
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 27 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Premysl Bercik may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
                        Bercik holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bercik no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in cluase 1.