Bercovici, Eduard (CPSO#: 88773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherway Medical Clinic
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 102
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-4762
Fax: (416) 622-4763
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
5WW - Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416)6036452
Fax: 416 603 5768
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eduard Bercovici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bercovici ( CPSO# 88773 )

Business Address:
Unit 5WW
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6452

Business Address:
Sherway Medical Clinic
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 102
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDUARD BERCOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCOVICI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2011 to 05 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013