Beres, Alana (CPSO#: 91892)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospital, 700 Ross Avenue East, P4N 8P2
Date Received: 11 Aug 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 24 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016