Berg, Marina (CPSO#: 79758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1120 Finch Ave West, Suite 105
North York ON  M3J 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 667-8498
Fax: (416) 667-8478
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006