Berger, Howard Phillip (CPSO#: 78439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Berger ( CPSO# 78439 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Suite 15-018B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Howard Phillip Berger may practise medicine independently in maternal fetal
            medicine and obstetrics, only.