Bergeron, Sheri Lyn (CPSO#: 92792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress Street
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Phone: (519) 974-7100
Fax: (519) 974-7672
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 5192545577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri L. Bergeron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bergeron ( CPSO# 92792 )

Business Address:
Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress Street
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Phone Number: (519) 974-7100

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 551-9849

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI LYN BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012