Bergman, Hagit (CPSO#: 94623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue west
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 2421000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Bergman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bergman ( CPSO# 52154 )
Dr. H. Bergman ( CPSO# 94623 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
Suite 205
1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H5
Phone Number: (416) 652-9862


Corporation Name: Dr. Hagit Bergman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bergman ( CPSO# 94623 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
1649 Dufferin Street
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M6H 4H5
Phone Number: (416) 652-9862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAGIT BERGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 03 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014