Berklayd, Pavel Michelovich (CPSO#: 77323)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Second Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Ins, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Nov 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2002