Berliner, Yaniv (CPSO#: 81594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berliner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Berliner ( CPSO# 81594 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9

Business Address:
22 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YANIV BERLINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006