Bernes, Carolyn Louise (CPSO#: 50247)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolyn Bernes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bernes ( CPSO# 50247 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Elaine Ma Oak Tree Family Health Centre Unit 7 730 Front Road Kingston ON K7M 6P7
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018