Bernstein, Leora Ruth (CPSO#: 95080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph Hospital Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Juarvinski Hospital
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leora Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bernstein ( CPSO# 95080 )

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEORA RUTH BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018