Bernstein, Steven Jason (CPSO#: 79387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centric Health Surgical Centre
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven J. Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bernstein ( CPSO# 79387 )

Business Address:
Crescent Oral Surgery
9251 Yonge St., #400
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8806

Business Address:
Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Ave. E.
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
Herzig Eye Institute
131 Bloor St. W. Suite 210
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Business Address:
Forest Hill Institute of Aesthetic Plastic Surgery
1188B Eglinton Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 785-7864

Business Address:
Dr. Bruce Rubin
1490 Danforth Ave. Suite 201
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 461-0424

Business Address:
Dr. Bruce Rubin
4040 Finch Ave. E. Suite 203
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-2022

Business Address:
Dr. Nolan Kane Facial and Cosmetic Surgery
7700 Bathurst St.
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 763-1107

Business Address:
Dr. Michael Kreidstein
300 York Mills Rd.
North York ON  M2L 2Y5

Business Address:
Gastroenterology Group
3200 Dufferin St. #505
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 256-9500

Business Address:
Dr. Suzanne Caudry
1235 Bay St. Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 928-3444

Business Address:
Toronto Facial Cosmetic Surgery Clinic
70 Yorkville Ave. Suite 31
Toronto ON  M3R 1B9
Phone Number: (647) 343-0207

Business Address:
Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Hwy #7 Suite 200
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
Promed Endoscopy Clinic
1315 Finch Ave. W.
Suite 302
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele St. Unit 4
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute (Plastica)
Level A Fairmont Royal York Hotel
100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 834-6640

Business Address:
Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
Sunrise Kids Dental
1089 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1N 4E4
Phone Number: (647) 350-7562

Business Address:
Face Cosmetic Surgery
186 George Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2N3
Phone Number: (416) 479-4244

Business Address:
Brampton Cosmetic Surgery and Medical Spa
145 Queen Street East
Suite 400
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 451-5855

Business Address:
Suite 200
236 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 713-9990

Business Address:
200 - 1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 968-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JASON BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008