Bertram, Jonathan Rajeevan (CPSO#: 90253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
3rd Floor Bell Gateway Building
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36019
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1O 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-0328
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Rajeevan Bertram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertram ( CPSO# 90253 )

Business Address:
100 Stokes Street
3rd Floor
Bell Gateway Building
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1O 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 523-0328

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN RAJEEVAN BERTRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2015